Financial history ANGLO-FRENCH MEDICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 327706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £100.14k £73.50k £85.94k £38.55k £4.52k
Total expenditure £100.10k £70.25k £82.72k £65.09k £9.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A