THE WINGATE SPECIAL CHILDRENS TRUST

Charity number: 327713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 01 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 01 December 2016 On time Download