Trustees VIPASSANA TRUST
Charity number: 327798

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Sze Hoo Chan | Chair | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Mullen | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cather | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angel David Yanez | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Wolstenholme | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chandani Kotecha | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Szabados Orsolya | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Marinela Ursu | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raquel Faraco | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Clifford | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Mitchell | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Coache | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stephen Doyle | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisle Turner | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dattaprasad Mandnikar | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.