THE COLOPLAST LIMITED CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 26 July 1988: Standard registration
- 31 January 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 MAY 1988 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 12 MARCH 1992 AND 2ND JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST OT APPLY THE INCOME THEROF AND ALSO SO MUCH OF THE CAPTIAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FORM TIME TO TIME IN FURTHERANCE AND PURSUANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECITON WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3(1)-(3) OF THE TRUST DEED.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.