RADHA MADHAV SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 327921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £480.67k £529.35k £435.27k £513.22k £554.47k
Total expenditure £406.11k £441.78k £426.52k £499.66k £484.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £529.35k N/A £513.18k £554.43k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £4 N/A £30 £33
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £425.06k N/A £490.52k £479.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £16.03k N/A £9.14k £5.40k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.31k N/A £1.59k £1.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £422.75k N/A £488.93k £464.34k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £349
Expenditure - Other N/A £684 N/A £0 £0