JIAN HUA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JHF's purpose is to build Asia through co-operation in education, development, medical and social services, serving her peoples with compassion, integrity and expertise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hong Kong
Governance
- 29 September 1988: Standard registration
- JHF JIAN HUA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE WERNHAM | Chair | 17 May 1996 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN HARVEY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARY PERKINS | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|||||
MEL RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
LEON CHENG TAI PHUA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL LEE DAVID WERNHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH WERNHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.99k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.33k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLES OF HONG KONG, CHINA AND ELSEWHERE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
HONG KONG, CHINA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 MORLEY ROAD
BASINGSTOKE
RG21 3LW
- Phone:
- 01256324431
- Email:
- jianhuauk@psmail.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window