THE CHEMICAL STRUCTURE ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Issue small research awards and grants to people working in the chemical information field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 January 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Jonathan Michael Goodman | Chair | 01 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raymond John Boucher | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Alan Winkler | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Simon Palmer | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Noel Michael O'Boyle | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Stembridge | Trustee | 30 October 2007 |
|
|
||||
Grace Ann Baysinger | Trustee | 01 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip James McHale | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
Helen Anne Lawlor | Trustee | 01 January 1990 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER FREDERICK RUSCH | Trustee | 01 January 1989 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Anne Warr | Trustee | 01 January 1989 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53 | £6.69k | £1 | £5.22k | £350 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.90k | £15.43k | £0 | £19.16k | £5.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE; (A) FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO THE AREA OF SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR THE STORAGE PROCESSING AND RETRIEVAL OF INFORMATION ABOUT AND RELATED TO CHEMICAL STRUCTURES, REACTIONS AND COMPOUNDS (B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSIDERED DESIRABLE FOR PURSUIT IN CONJUNCTION WITHTHE AFORESAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Roundshead Drive
Warfield
BRACKNELL
RG42 3RZ
- Phone:
- 01344868425
- Email:
- bob_stembridge@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window