Trustees JEWISH MUSIC INSTITUTE

Charity number: 328228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER ANNE JANKEL Chair
None on record
LEONARD LOWY Trustee 29 May 2023
BERT JANSCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Inbal Annabel Elad Trustee 13 March 2023
None on record
Charles Michael Richardson Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Karen Gilbert Trustee 04 March 2019
None on record
Dr Vanessa Paloma Elbaz Trustee 04 March 2019
None on record
Alexander Victor Knapp Trustee 02 October 2013
None on record
JONATHON EDWARD LYONS Trustee
None on record
REVEREND MALCOLM WEISMAN Trustee
None on record
IAN BRAIDMAN Trustee
None on record
Dr NORMAN SOLOMON Trustee
THE NORDEV TRUST
Received: On time
STUART APPLEMAN Trustee
JEWISH FAMILY CENTRE LTD
Received: On time