Financial history MICHAELHOUSE UK TRUST

Charity number: 328512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £26.19k £42.76k £26.08k £27.69k £47.04k
Total expenditure £18.51k £39.68k £31.57k £6.65k £52.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A