Financial history MARCHING & PERFORMING ARTS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 328541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £39.45k £61.56k £61.49k £105.13k £44.04k
Total expenditure £36.07k £56.64k £57.80k £58.16k £43.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A