Governing document MARCHING & PERFORMING ARTS UNITED KINGDOM
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 1 NOVEMBER 1986, 20 APRIL 1991, 21 AUGUST 1993, 22 OCTOBER 2006 AND 7 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL AND PERFORMING ARTS EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM BY HELPING TO TRAIN THEM IN THE PLAYING OF INSTRUMENTS AND USE OF EQUIPMENT BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND EXHIBITIONS AT WHICH SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE MAY PERFORM TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.