Financial history AHIMSA

Charity number: 328598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £107.62k £126.08k £76.20k £106.29k £174.48k
Total expenditure £80.49k £83.48k £112.46k £124.13k £127.36k
Income from government contracts £7.90k £22.50k £30.00k £43.17k £9.58k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £31.00k