NATIONAL FRUIT COLLECTIONS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the trust was established for the advancement of the educaiton of the public in the art and science of horticulture, research into fruit husbandry, and the conservation and evaluation of cultivars of fruit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 20 June 1990: Standard registration
- THE BROGDALE HORTICULTURAL TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Matthew Ordidge | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Fraser Collier | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ellis | Trustee | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILL ANDREW SIBLEY | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BARLOW | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR PAUL HADLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.58k | £6.67k | £7.65k | £11.11k | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.02k | £55.88k | £109.78k | £0 | £7.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 APR 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 NOV 2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF HORTICULTURE, AND MORE PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE GROWTH CULTIVATION UTILISATION AND NUTRITIONAL PROPERTIES OF FRUIT TREES AND BUSHES AND ALL OTHER PLANTS PRODUCING EDIBLE PRODUCTS AND THE DISSEMINATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARM ADVISORY SERVICES TEAM
BROGDALE ROAD
OSPRINGE
FAVERSHAM
ME13 8XZ
- Phone:
- 01795533225
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window