Accounts and annual returns DORIS FIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 August 2022 21 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2022 21 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 August 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2021 21 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 August 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 August 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 August 2018 28 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2018 28 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window