ASYLUM AID

Charity number: 328729
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Income from government contracts £222.99k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £992.29k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £998.70k £397.31k £0 £0 £0