ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND -

Charity number: 1053793-37
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND AT THEIR DISCRETION, SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE, THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE COMMUNITY SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 27 November 1996: Standard registration
  • 30 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
  • BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Previous name)
  • BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON NHS COMMUNITY NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
  • BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON NHS TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Previous name)
  • SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH GENERAL (Previous name)
  • SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Previous name)