Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST STAFF WELFARE
Charity number: 1053793-40
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996
AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000
AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN THE TRUST BY PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES BY THE STAFF OF THE SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 29 November 1996: Standard registration
- 27 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST STAFF WELFARE (Previous name)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON COMMUNITY NHS TRUST STAFF WELFARE (Previous name)
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH STAFF WELFARE (Previous name)
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST STAFF WELFARE (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.