Financial history THE CARL KLEIN TRUST

Charity number: 1062428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £90 £96 £120 £69 £17
Total expenditure £2.22k £1.57k £18 £1.17k £3.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A