DCI ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 1999: Standard registration
- 25 January 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COMMUNITY INITIATIVES ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND SERVICES SUCH AS COUNSELLING, ADVICE TRAINING ETC. TO ADVANCE AND IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN DIRECT PURSUIT OF THEIR OBJECTS FOR ALL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FORM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window