Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (MILTON KEYNES)

Charity number: 1061836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required