LIVER CANCER SURGERY APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
About the charity, LCSA raises funds to provide diagnostic and surgical equipment vital to the recovery of patients with secondary liver cancer. Establishing a research programme using data collected from patients, comparing surgery with radiofrequency ablation for destroying liver tumours. Distributes a patient's guide for treatment options to GP surgeries and hospital clinics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 08 April 1997: Standard registration
- LCSA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Angelika Riga | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Baker | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NARIMAN DADY KARANJIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.04k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 4TH MARCH 1997. SUPPLEMENTAL DEED MADE 7TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND IN PARTICULAR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LIVER CANCER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT FOR LIVER CANCER SURGERY IN THE SOUTH EAST OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
SURREY, SUSSEX, MIDDLESEX, HAMPSHIRE AND BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beechtrees
Colekitchen Lane
Gomshall
GUILDFORD
GU5 9QB
- Phone:
- 07775 501404
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window