THE TOWER PROJECT

Charity number: 1061626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On time Download