Financial history THE TOWER PROJECT

Charity number: 1061626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.42m £3.64m £3.78m £3.98m £3.81m
Total expenditure £3.31m £3.48m £3.64m £3.08m £3.12m
Income from government contracts £565.20k £810.69k £787.57k £953.11k £730.37k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £532.26k £444.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £42.95k £45.87k £28.90k £561.37k £484.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.38m £3.59m £3.75m £3.42m £3.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £585 £1.08k £1.27k £260 £214
Income - Other £351 £13 £153 £0 £6.43k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.31m £3.47m £3.63m £3.07m £3.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.92k £7.51k £8.05k £7.59k £8.01k
Expenditure - Governance £19.01k £21.20k £21.07k £22.02k £23.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0