TREE TRUST FOR HARINGEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the Haringey tree warden training scheme, giving talks to schools and societies, representing threatened trees through the planning process, campaigning for better tree protection and aftercare. Encouraging well-planned tree planting, discouraging habitat destruction, developing website for updating TPO and other records by trained tree wardens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Haringey
Governance
- 17 March 1998: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £423 | £302 | £302 | £174 | £155 | |
|
Total expenditure | £567 | £272 | £272 | £53 | £146 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 07 April 2016 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 31 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH FEBRUARY 1996, AND AMENDED 19TH FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROVISION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF TREES ON PUBLIC AND PRIVATE LAND AND ON HIGHWAYS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (2) TO EDUCATE PEOPLE IN THE AMENITY AND ECOLOGY VALUE OF TREES; AND (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ON THE PLANTING AND MAINTENANCE OF TREES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window