Financial history BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE BIBLE LANDS MUSEUM, JERUSALEM

Charity number: 1062357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.19m £2.96m £1.16m £1.16m £1.11m
Total expenditure £968.58k £881.63k £786.43k £782.27k £807.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £37.40k £1.75m £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.14m £1.19m £1.15m £1.16m £1.10m
Income - Other £7.86k £12.00k £10.37k £8.39k £6.75k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £800.22k £695.30k £608.39k £584.68k £608.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £6.51k £6.95k £53.26k £64.12k
Expenditure - Governance £206.36k £49.30k £29.64k £8.67k £22.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £593.86k £646.00k £0 £576.01k £586.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £168.36k £179.81k £171.09k £144.34k £135.71k