Accounts and annual returns HAWLEY PAVILION TRUST

Charity number: 1061769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 02 September 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 09 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required