HERTSMERE JEWISH PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant and buildings provider
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 March 1997: Standard registration
- HJPS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JUSTIN DENBY | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN ANTONY BOHM | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR D SUMMERFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £418.38k | £282.88k | £334.94k | £292.44k | £220.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £487.45k | £406.75k | £460.64k | £416.80k | £295.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £89.13k | £9.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 March 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 25 September 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL) BY PROMOTING THE SCHOOL AND FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL UNDER THE RELIGIOUS DIRECTION OF THE CHIEF RABBI AND IN ACCORDANCE WITHIN THE AIMS OF THE SCHOOL AS DETERMINED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE BOARD AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS OF ACADEMIC EXCELLENCE IN BOTH JEWISH AND SECULAR SUBJECTS AND PROMOTING JEWISH BELIEFS, VALUES AND TRADITIONS WHEREVER POSSIBLE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION, TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR OTHERWISE AS THE BOARD SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HERTSMERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hertsmere Jewish Primary School
Watling Street
Radlett
WD7 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01923855857
- Email:
- hjpstrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window