CITIZENS ADVICE EAST BERKSHIRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1065672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information and advice to the public of Bracknell Forest, Maidenehad & Windsor and surrounding areas for the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1997: Standard registration
  • 20 January 2022: Funds received from 1085297 CITIZENS ADVICE MAIDENHEAD AND WINDSOR
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BRACKNELL AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
  • BRACKNELL CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Geoffrey REynolds Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Simon Wray Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Suzanne Jayne McVie Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Tsung Ling Katy Lau Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Lewis Stuart Jackman-Clarke Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Nitin Suneja Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Dimitri Naumenko-Pronin Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Tonderai Mugabe Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Shabnam Jabine Ali Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Hazel Carol Standbridge Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Penny Thorpe Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Cheryl Anne Coppell Trustee 19 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £340.33k £420.64k £984.91k £817.05k £801.62k
Total expenditure £322.17k £404.61k £769.71k £739.86k £862.69k
Income from government contracts £89.61k £166.53k £308.87k £651.01k £523.22k
Income from government grants £188.05k £198.43k £199.86k £92.52k £210.44k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £435.50k £793.49k £794.44k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £14.01k £1.67k £595
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £376.01k £17.74k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £894 £4.10k £6.58k
Income - Other N/A N/A £158.50k £53 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £769.71k £739.86k £862.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.80k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £7 £98

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £48.83k £28.21k £18.71k
Long-term investments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A £502.10k £525.04k £417.59k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A -£3.97k £2.53k £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £185.17k £113.77k £55.49k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lower Ground Floor
The Columbia Centre
Market Street
Bracknell
Berkshire
RG12 1JG
Phone:
01628 674842