THE ROWLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1062148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patrick Wrixon Trustee 19 April 2021
THE CART SHED CHARITY Received: On time
IAN JAMES CROCKATT SMITH Chair 27 April 2015
THE KILDARE TRUST Received: On time
QUEEN ELIZABETH ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
MR GARY BARBER Trustee 06 September 2011
THE MICHAEL MARSH CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE COOK AND WOLSTENHOLME CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE DMF ELLIS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE MONTAL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Rebecca Widdowson Trustee 03 February 2020
SPORTS PARTNERSHIP HEREFORDSHIRE AND WORCESTERSHIRE Received: On time
DIANA CHARLOTTE CRABTREE Trustee 21 February 2014 None on record