Financial history MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1061798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £3.03m £641.46k £1.01m £2.76m £2.95m
Total expenditure £118.09k £3.12m £641.64k £1.49m £499.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.75m £470.03k £829.79k £2.62m £2.85m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £71.98k £94.61k £91.40k £94.16k £90.12k
Income - Other £207.83k £76.82k £88.10k £49.42k £19.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £96.01k £3.10m £615.21k £1.47m £476.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.08k £17.58k £26.43k £16.34k £22.66k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £96.01k £3.10m £615.21k £1.47m £476.34k
Expenditure - Investment management £22.08k £17.58k £26.43k £16.34k £22.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0