THE MUSLIM ACADEMIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of religion and education through publishing and creating educational and religious institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Timothy Winter | Chair |
|
||||||
Nabila Winter | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sohail Bhatti | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.07k | £76.28k | £44.48k | £41.07k | £12.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.66k | £15.89k | £61.78k | £70.52k | £56.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 1997, SUPPLEMENTARY DEED DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE , SUPPORT AND PROMOTE THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH THROUGH THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE OF RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS FOR THIS PURPOSE; THROUGH SUPPORT OF THE RELIGIOUS AND GENERAL EDUCATION OF MUSLIM STUDENTS; AND THROUGH THE PROTECTION , PRESERVATION , STUDY , TRANSLATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE INTELLECTUAL HERITAGE AND LITERARY WORKS OF IMAM ABU HAMID AL-GHAZALI; AJD THROUGH THE SPONSORSHIP AND FREE OR SUBSIDISED DISTRIBUTION OF THE SAID LITERARY WORKED AND OTHER LITERARY WORKED BEARING ON ISLAM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hill Farm View
Dullingham
NEWMARKET
Suffolk
CB8 9FF
- Phone:
- 01638508113
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window