ST TUDY PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1061819
Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 326 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 326 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 August 2020 200 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required