ST TUDY PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1061819
Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.30k £666 £10.76k £147.53k £47.71k
Total expenditure £1.63k £265 £274 £11.33k £27.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A