SUFFOLK COUNTY BOWLS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds and receive donations to be used to relieve cases of need, hardship or distress of persons who are or have been members of bowls clubs affiliated to the Suffolk County Bowls Association and after the decease of such persons any surviving spouse or dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 31 July 1997: Standard registration
- S C B A BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- SUFFOLK COUNTY BONDS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mervyn Thomas | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE EDWARD BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD GEORGE WHYMARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.20k | £560 | £2.18k | £5.34k | £5.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.65k | £2.94k | £1.76k | £3.03k | £3.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF THE BOWLS CLUBS AFFILIATED TO SUFFOLK COUNTY BOWLS ASSOCIATION AND AFTER THE DECEASE OF SUCH PERSONS, THEIR SURVIVING SPOUSE OR DEPENDENTS.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 COTTINGHAM ROAD
IPSWICH
IP8 3SA
- Phone:
- 01473689503
- Email:
- geoffwbarker@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window