Trustees THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (SOMERSET BRANCH)

Charity number: 1061910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN DOBSON Chair 04 April 2019
WOOLAVINGTON OLD VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Pamela Joan Cornwell Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
Julia Roles Trustee 08 April 2021
None on record
Gill Forsyth Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
BARBARA JONES Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Tim Morgan Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
WILLIAM LYNES Trustee 13 April 2017
None on record
RACHEL GARRETT Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
GRAHAM BECKINSALE Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record
ELIZABETH ANN BECKINSALE Trustee 13 September 2013
None on record