Trustees INTERNATIONAL RESCUE COMMITTEE, U.K
Charity number: 1065972

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noelia Serrano | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Najwa Al Abdallah | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Hon. Alistair James Hendrie Burt | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Huey Nhan-O'Reilly | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr TITILOLA BANJOKO | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Cressida Pollock | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
KATHRYN ELIZABETH LUDLOW | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
Kemal Ahmed | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Thomas George WINTER | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Francesco Ugo Maria Garzarelli | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
SIR Hugh Nigel Edward Bayley | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Ciaran Donnelly | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
LYNETTE MARY LOWNDES | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.