Citizens Advice Greenwich

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR MISSION IS : - TO PROVIDE THE ADVICE PEOPLE NEED FOR THE PROBLEMS THEY FACE - TO IMPROVE THE POLICIES AND PRACTICES THAT AFFECT PEOPLE'S LIVES GCAB PROVIDES FREE, INDEPENDENT, CONFIDENTIAL AND IMPARTIAL ADVICE TO PEOPLE IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF GREENWICH AND SURROUNDING AREAS ON THEIR RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES AND TO SEAFARERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS ACROSS THE UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£963,166
Donations and legacies | £50 | |
Charitable activities | £963.12k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£942,178
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £942.18k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £464,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £464,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £942.18k | |
Retained for future use | £20.99k |
People

21 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 September 1997: Standard registration
- GREENWICH CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LTD (Working name)
- GREENWICH CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jane Stone | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Wilson | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean Michael Craddock | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andriy Voshchevskyy | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cindi Van Graan | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Walker | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Dabiri | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30m | £1.03m | £980.91k | £842.51k | £963.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08m | £1.07m | £1.01m | £889.21k | £942.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £365.00k | £464.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £691.58k | £586.88k | N/A | £365.50k | £464.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.99k | £0 | £0 | £2.22k | £50 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.30m | £1.02m | £980.91k | £810.96k | £963.12k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £11.33k | £0 | £29.33k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £1.07m | £1.01m | £889.21k | £942.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.15k | £5.70k | £7.03k | £12.52k | £6.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.68k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £550.71k | £454.29k | £454.54k | £329.31k | £338.77k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£100.80k | -£144.00k | -£135.00k | -£126.00k | -£117.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £94.51k | £41.86k | £81.16k | £11.63k | £9.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 1997 as amended on 14 Sep 2020 as amended on 27 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF , THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY , SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Wing
The Gatehouse
Frances Street
LONDON
SE18 5EF
- Phone:
- 02083127311
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window