Accounts and annual returns ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1062237

Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 87 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 87 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 452 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 452 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 February 2022 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 250 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 September 2020 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 September 2020 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 19 October 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 19 October 2018 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window