Financial history ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1062237
Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £70.57k £75.34k £82.63k £73.82k £102.45k
Total expenditure £67.24k £68.93k £75.87k £79.85k £78.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £48.90k £47.50k £58.81k £57.19k £62.47k