ST MARY'S PRE-SCHOOL (SWANAGE)

Charity number: 1062936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUCY OGDEN Trustee 12 March 2015 None on record
Susan Edmondston Trustee 22 December 2014 None on record
Helen Hogg Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record
Abigail Notley Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
Davina Tomes Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
SAMANTHA KIRKPATRICK Chair 11 November 2015 None on record