Governance TEENAGE CANCER TRUST
Charity number: 1062559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 29 May 1997: Standard registration
- 22 February 2017: Funds received from 1049851 THE PATRICIA MARY GAMMON TRUST
- 01 November 2018: Funds received from 1150083 THE JANE KASLER FOUNDATION
- 11 February 2019: Funds received from 1141849 NEVER GIVE UP
- 25 August 2022: Funds received from 327529 THE MOSS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 15 February 2023: Funds received from 1147442 PETER'S PLACE
- 05 April 2023: Funds received from 1117581 BARNSLEY CANCER AFTERCARE
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1178893 RHYS' DONATION FOUNDATION
- 24 January 2024: Funds received from 268645 MRS S L CHAMBERS' CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.