TEENAGE CANCER TRUST

Charity number: 1062559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL SPANSWICK Chair 05 January 2012 None on record
Susan Jane Morgan Trustee 04 May 2021
RJC PRODUCTIONS LTD Received: On time
MR RONNIE HARRIS Trustee
THE ILLSLEY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Caren Ayre Hindmarsh Trustee 20 July 2015 None on record
Jeremy Harmsworth Shute Trustee 20 July 2015 None on record
RICHARD BARRY ROSENBERG Trustee None on record
ANDREW NICHOLAS HEYWOOD HUGHES Trustee 05 January 2012 None on record
Richard Martin Baillie Waterworth Trustee 11 February 2021 None on record
Jeremy Paul Seigal Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
Varda Shine Trustee 20 July 2015 None on record