THE FAWCETT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1108769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Resham Kotecha Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record
Iain Simpson Trustee 25 May 2017 None on record
FIONA MACTAGGART RT HON Chair 26 April 2018
COMMONWEAL HOUSING LIMITED Received: On time
AGENDA CIO Received: On time
AYESHA HAZARIKA Trustee 17 November 2018
REPRIEVE Received: On time
Emily Anstead Trustee 17 November 2018 None on record
Baroness Anne Jenkin Trustee 17 November 2018 None on record
TANYA TUNLEY Trustee 10 October 2015 None on record
Karen Bradshaw Trustee 25 May 2017 None on record
Samantha Walker Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record
Liz Moseley Trustee 17 November 2018 None on record
Rachel McLachlan Trustee 18 November 2017 None on record
Zahra Latif Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record