Financial history STOP HATE UK

Charity number: 1062692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 30/09/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £469.05k £395.80k £829.11k £295.27k £673.09k
Total expenditure £448.27k £422.83k £730.17k £282.52k £600.51k
Income from government contracts £173.94k N/A £258.30k N/A £70.50k
Income from government grants £60.00k £59.40k £140.71k £48.44k £102.90k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £251.56k N/A £286.11k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £45.37k N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £532.18k N/A £386.98k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £719.23k N/A £596.11k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £10.94k N/A £4.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £3.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0