Financial history MOUNTAIN TRAINING TRUST

Charity number: 1064023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.35m £2.93m £3.92m £2.64m £3.54m
Total expenditure £3.32m £2.95m £3.06m £2.67m £3.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £548.35k £780.85k
Income from government grants £866.59k £742.72k N/A N/A £826.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £510 £742.72k £766.37k £835.19k £856.85k
Income - Other trading activities £1.25m £511.15k £514.49k £22.67k £275.45k
Income - Charitable activities £2.09m £1.66m £1.59m £350.27k £1.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.82k £21.18k £20.18k £18.12k £21.96k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.03m £1.41m £845.37k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.13m £1.81m £2.15m £1.49m £1.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.20m £1.15m £913.24k £1.18m £1.47m
Expenditure - Governance £57.83k £0 £26.91k £10.18k £8.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0