Accounts and annual returns SUTTON CHENEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1072482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 February 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 October 2020 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 October 2020 621 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required