Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THORNTON

Charity number: 1064059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 July 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 July 2020 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 July 2019 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 July 2019 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 August 2018 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 August 2018 32 days late Download Open in new window