NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BANGLADESH CENTRE

Charity number: 1064788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 March 2021 410 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 04 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required