BRICKHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1062763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £49.52k £53.20k £51.15k £49.31k £45.09k
Total expenditure £42.08k £46.40k £51.59k £47.93k £51.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A