Governing document MARINE STEWARDSHIP COUNCIL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 17 FEBRUARY 1997, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 16 OCT 1997, 21ST JUNE 2001, 5TH NOV 2003, 3 FEB 2006, 4 DEC 2009 AND 3 MAR 2010 AND RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 SEPT 2010 as amended on 09 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO CONSERVE THE MARINE AND FRESHWATER ENVIRONMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF CONSERVATION, PARTICULARLY. BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY . BY [A] CONSERVING MARINE AND FRESHWATER FISH POPULATIONS AND THE ENVIRONMENT ON WHICH THEY DEPEND; [B] PROMOTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT OF FISHERIES, AND ENSURING THE SUSTAINABILITY OF GLOBAL FISH STOCKS AND THE HEALTH OF AQUATIC ECOSYSTEMS GENERALLY; [C] ESTABLISHING AND PROMOTING THE APPLICATION OF A BROAD SET OF PRINCIPLES, STANDARDS AND CRITERIA FOR SUSTAINABLE FISHINGG
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.